WA HB1762 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the relationship between a health insurer and a contracting health care provider.
Title
Concerning the relationship between a health insurer and a contracting health care provider.
Sponsors
Rep. Marcus Riccelli [D] | Rep. Joe Schmick [R] | Rep. Laurie Jinkins [D] | Rep. Paul Harris [R] |
Rep. Eileen Cody [D] | Sen. Kevin Van De Wege [D] | Sen. June Robinson [D] | Rep. Steve Tharinger [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-09 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 82 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-02-02 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2016-02-02 | House | Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2016-01-11 | House | Referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
2016-01-11 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2016-01-11 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. |
2015-03-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health Care. |
2015-03-09 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 82; nays, 16; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2015-03-09 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-03-09 | House | Floor amendment |
2015-03-09 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2015-03-06 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2015-02-20 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-02-18 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2015-02-18 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-02-18 | House | HCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-02-18 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:00 PM. |
2015-02-04 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2015-01-28 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness |
Same As/Similar To
SB5474 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.