WA HB1756 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the safety and security of adult entertainers.
Title
Concerning the safety and security of adult entertainers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-22 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | House | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-05-08 | House | Chapter 304, 2019 Laws. |
2019-05-08 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-26 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-22 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 94; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-04-22 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | LBRC - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:30 AM. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 10:00 AM. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
2019-03-05 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-03-05 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-05 | House | Floor amendment |
2019-03-04 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-18 | House | LAWS - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-18 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-30 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5724 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.