WA HB1738 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Relieving burdens on small businesses by updating the tax return filing thresholds to reflect inflation.
Title
Relieving burdens on small businesses by updating the tax return filing thresholds to reflect inflation.
Sponsors
Rep. Vicki Kraft [R] | Rep. Drew Stokesbary [R] | Rep. Jim Walsh [R] | Rep. Brandon Vick [R] |
Rep. Jesse Young [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-21 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-16 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-10 | House | APP - Majority; do pass 2nd substitute bill proposed by Finance. |
2020-02-10 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-05 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-30 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-01-28 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-01-28 | House | FIN - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | House | Referred to Finance. |
2020-01-13 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-26 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-03-21 | House | FIN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-03-21 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-29 | House | First reading, referred to Finance. |