WA HB1716 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-17 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-17 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning locations at which ballots may be cast.
Title
Concerning locations at which ballots may be cast.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate Committee on State Government & Elections: do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-17 - House - House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate Committee on State Government & Elections: do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-17 - House - House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | House | Effective date 6/9/2022. |
2022-03-17 | House | Chapter 69, 2022 Laws. |
2022-03-17 | House | Governor signed. |
2022-03-08 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2022-03-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | SGE - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 8:30 AM. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government & Elections. |
2022-01-28 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 92; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2022-01-28 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-01-28 | House | Floor amendment |
2022-01-28 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2022-01-25 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-01-20 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-01-17 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-01-17 | House | SGOV - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-01-17 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2022-01-13 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. |
2021-12-28 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29a | 08 | 140 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
29a | 40 | 160 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
29a | 84 | 510 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |