WA HB1702 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Technology & Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Technology & Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the authority of port districts to provide telecommunications services.
Title
Concerning the authority of port districts to provide telecommunications services.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Dye [R] | Rep. Gael Tarleton [D] | Rep. Terry Nealey [R] | Rep. Jake Fey [D] |
Rep. Bradley Klippert [R] | Rep. Jesse Young [R] | Rep. Brandon Vick [R] | Rep. Jim Walsh [R] |
Rep. Monica Stonier [D] | Rep. Joe Fitzgibbon [D] | Rep. Norm Johnson [R] | Rep. Richard Muri [R] |
Sen. Derek Stanford [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-02-07 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM. |
2017-01-26 | House | First reading, referred to Technology & Economic Development |
Same As/Similar To
SB5679 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - On motion, referred to Energy, Environment & Technology.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1702&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1702.pdf |