WA HB1698 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Providing flexibility for the department of fish and wildlife to collaborate with local governments to manage gray wolves.
Title
Providing flexibility for the department of fish and wildlife to collaborate with local governments to manage gray wolves.
Sponsors
Rep. Joel Kretz [R] | Sen. Mike Chapman [D] | Rep. Debra Lekanoff [D] | Rep. Tom Dent [R] |
Rep. Jacquelin Maycumber [R] | Rep. Lawrence Springer [D] | Rep. Melanie Morgan [D] | Rep. Carolyn Eslick [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-17 - House - House Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2023-02-17 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2023-02-17 | House | AGNR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-02-17 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 10:30 AM. |
2023-02-08 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. |
2023-02-01 | House | First reading, referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 01 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
77 | 12 | 020 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |