WA HB1682 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-10 - Returned to House Rules.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-10 - Returned to House Rules.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a compliance pathway specific to emissions-intensive, trade-exposed businesses for achieving their proportionate share of the state's emissions reduction limits through 2050.
Title
Concerning a compliance pathway specific to emissions-intensive, trade-exposed businesses for achieving their proportionate share of the state's emissions reduction limits through 2050.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Fitzgibbon [D] | Rep. Alex Ramel [D] | Rep. Davina Duerr [D] | Rep. Liz Berry [D] |
Rep. Nicole Macri [D] | Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] | Rep. David Hackney [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-28 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House Committee on Environment & Energy: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House Committee on Environment & Energy: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | Returned to House Rules. |
2022-03-01 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-28 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-02-28 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-02-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 11:00 AM. |
2022-02-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 11:00 AM. |
2022-02-02 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2022-02-01 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-02-01 | House | ENVI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-02-01 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to Environment & Energy. |
2021-12-21 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70a | 65 | 110 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70a | 65 | 230 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70a | 65 | 260 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |