WA HB1682 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Communicating claim closures by self-insured employers.
Title
Communicating claim closures by self-insured employers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | House | House Rules "X" file. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-12 | House | LAWS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-12 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-07 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-28 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards. |