WA HB1663 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-25 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-25 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Reducing methane emissions from landfills.
Title
Reducing methane emissions from landfills.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 58 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 30 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 13 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-05 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - House - House Committee on Environment & Energy: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 30 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 13 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-05 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - House - House Committee on Environment & Energy: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-25 | House | Effective date 6/9/2022. |
2022-03-25 | House | Chapter 179, 2022 Laws. |
2022-03-25 | House | Governor signed. |
2022-03-10 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-09 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 58; nays, 38; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2022-03-09 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 30; nays, 17; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | ENET - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. |
2022-02-11 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 57; nays, 40; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2022-02-11 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-11 | House | Floor amendment |
2022-02-11 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2022-02-09 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-05 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-02-05 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-02-05 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2022-02-04 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-24 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2022-01-20 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-01-20 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-01-20 | House | ENVI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-01-20 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 1:30 PM. |
2022-01-11 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to Environment & Energy. |
2021-12-17 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70a | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
70a | 15 | 3160 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
70a | 65 | 080 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |