WA HB1654 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a regional fire protection service authority within the boundaries of a single city.
Title
Establishing a regional fire protection service authority within the boundaries of a single city.
Sponsors
Rep. Marcus Riccelli [D] | Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] | Rep. Joe Fitzgibbon [D] | Rep. Gael Tarleton [D] |
Sen. Kevin Van De Wege [D] | Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-13 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-09 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-09 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-02-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor. |
2014-02-13 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 71; nays, 25; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2014-02-13 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-13 | House | Floor amendment |
2014-02-13 | House | Returned to second reading for amendment. |
2014-01-20 | House | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-11-07 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-04-28 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 10:00 AM. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Governmental Operations. |
2013-03-09 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 60; nays, 37; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2013-03-09 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-03-09 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2013-03-06 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2013-02-26 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-02-26 | House | Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2013-02-22 | House | Referred to Finance. |
2013-02-22 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2013-02-22 | House | LG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2013-02-22 | House | LG - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-02-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. |
2013-02-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2013-02-04 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |