WA HB1650 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-03 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-03 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring voter approval for local government prohibitions on cannabis businesses.
Title
Requiring voter approval for local government prohibitions on cannabis businesses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-18 - House - House Committee on Regulated Substances & Gaming: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - House Committee on Regulated Substances & Gaming: do pass (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - House Committee on Regulated Substances & Gaming: do pass (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-03 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2024-02-01 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-23 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2024-01-18 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-01-18 | House | RSG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-01-18 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Regulated Substances & Gaming at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-16 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Regulated Substances & Gaming at 4:00 PM. |
2024-01-09 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Regulated Substances & Gaming at 4:00 PM. |
2024-01-08 | House | Referred to Regulated Substances & Gaming. |
2024-01-08 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2024-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2023-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2023-02-16 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2023-02-16 | House | RSG - Majority; do pass. |
2023-02-16 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Regulated Substances & Gaming at 8:00 AM. |
2023-01-31 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Regulated Substances & Gaming at 4:00 PM. |
2023-01-27 | House | First reading, referred to Regulated Substances & Gaming. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 21 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
35a | 21 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 01 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
69 | 50 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
69 | 50 | 540 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |