WA HB1638 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-15 - Effective date 5/15/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-15 - Effective date 5/15/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creating a state trooper expedited recruitment incentive program.
Title
Creating a state trooper expedited recruitment incentive program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-19 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Committee on Transportation: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - House Committee on Transportation: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Committee on Transportation: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - House Committee on Transportation: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-15 | House | Effective date 5/15/2023. |
2023-05-15 | House | Chapter 459, 2023 Laws. |
2023-05-15 | House | Governor signed. |
2023-04-22 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2023-04-21 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-04-20 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-04-19 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2023-04-19 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 11:30 AM. |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2023-02-27 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2023-02-27 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-02-27 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2023-02-22 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2023-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2023-02-16 | House | TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-02-16 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM. |
2023-02-06 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM. |
2023-01-27 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |