WA HB1630 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing minors to consent to share their personally identifying information in the Washington homeless client management information system.
Title
Allowing minors to consent to share their personally identifying information in the Washington homeless client management information system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-11 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-11 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-09 | House | Effective date 6/7/2018. |
2018-03-09 | House | Chapter 15, 2018 Laws. |
2018-03-09 | House | Governor signed. |
2018-03-06 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | HSC - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-05-29 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 92; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-05-05 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Mental Health & Housing. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 90; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 6. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | HSMH - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Mental Health & Housing at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Mental Health & Housing at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Mental Health & Housing. |
2017-03-03 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2017-03-03 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-03-02 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2017-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-10 | House | ELHS - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-10 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 10:00 AM. |
2017-02-08 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-25 | House | First reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services |
Same As/Similar To
SB5625 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - Due to Senate committee reorganization, referred to Human Services & Corrections.