WA HB1614 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the home cultivation of cannabis.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning the home cultivation of cannabis.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-16 - House - House Committee on Regulated Substances & Gaming: do pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-08HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2023-02-24HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
2023-02-22HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2023-02-17HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2023-02-16HouseMinority; do not pass.
2023-02-16HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2023-02-16HouseRSG - Majority; do pass.
2023-02-16HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Regulated Substances & Gaming at 8:00 AM.
2023-02-09HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Regulated Substances & Gaming at 8:00 AM.
2023-02-02HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Regulated Substances & Gaming at 8:00 AM.
2023-01-26HouseFirst reading, referred to Regulated Substances & Gaming.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6950101Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
69504013Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6950505Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
780120Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback