WA HB1612 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-11 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-11 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Making technical cross-reference corrections in statutes governing unemployment insurance.
Title
Making technical cross-reference corrections in statutes governing unemployment insurance.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Sells [D] | Rep. Liz Berry [D] | Rep. Emily Wicks [D] | Rep. Tarra Simmons [D] |
Rep. Kirsten Harris-Talley [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs: do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-21 - House - House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs: do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-21 - House - House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-11 | House | Effective date 6/9/2022. |
2022-03-11 | House | Chapter 17, 2022 Laws. |
2022-03-11 | House | Governor signed. |
2022-03-07 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-02 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | LCTA - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs at 10:30 AM. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs. |
2022-02-09 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2022-02-09 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-09 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-01-25 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-01-21 | House | LAWS - Majority; do pass. |
2022-01-21 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-19 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-11 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards. |
2021-12-07 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
50 | 29 | 025 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
50 | 29 | 070 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |