WA HB1612 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing the payment of workers' compensation benefits by self-insured employers pending appeal.
Title
Addressing the payment of workers' compensation benefits by self-insured employers pending appeal.
Sponsors
Sen. June Robinson [D] | Rep. Chris Reykdal [D] | Rep. Michael Sells [D] | Rep. Hans Dunshee [D] |
Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-01-11 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-02-12 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-02-12 | House | LAB - Majority; do pass. |
2015-02-12 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. |
2015-02-05 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. |
2015-01-23 | House | First reading, referred to Labor |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1612&year=2015 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2015-16/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1612.pdf |