WA HB1588 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-2)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-13 - Referred to Judiciary.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-13 - Referred to Judiciary.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring universal background checks for firearms transfers.
Title
Requiring universal background checks for firearms transfers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-13 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2014-01-13 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2014-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-11-07 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-03-13 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-03-09 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2013-02-22 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-02-19 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2013-02-19 | House | JUDI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2013-02-19 | House | JUDI - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-02-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2013-02-13 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2013-01-31 | House | First reading, referred to Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5625 (Crossfiled) 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.