WA HB1585 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-05 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-05 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Providing a right of first repurchase for surplus transportation property.
Title
Providing a right of first repurchase for surplus transportation property.
Sponsors
Rep. Jesse Young [R] | Rep. Matt Shea [R] | Rep. Elizabeth Scott [R] | Rep. Graham Hunt [R] |
Rep. David Taylor [R] | Rep. Sharon Santos [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-13 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2016-02-04 | House | TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2016-02-04 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2016-01-11 | House | Referred to Transportation. |
2016-01-11 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2015-04-24 | House | On Concurrence Calendar. Referred to House Rules 3. |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2015-03-11 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2015-03-11 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-03-04 | House | Placed on second reading. |
2015-03-04 | House | Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2015-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-02-24 | House | TR - Majority; do pass. |
2015-02-24 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2015-02-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2015-01-23 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation |