WA HB1583 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-10)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Health Care and Wellness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Health Care and Wellness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creating the profession of certified peer specialists.
Title
Creating the profession of certified peer specialists.
Sponsors
Rep. Carolyn Eslick [R] | Rep. Lauren Davis [D] | Rep. Mary Dye [R] | Rep. Lisa Callan [D] |
Rep. Andrew Barkis [R] | Rep. Nicole Macri [D] | Rep. Jenny Graham [R] | Rep. Tina Orwall [D] |
Rep. Mike Volz [R] | Rep. Marcus Riccelli [D] | Rep. Sam Low [R] | Rep. Travis Couture [R] |
Rep. Tom Dent [R] | Rep. Tana Senn [D] | Rep. My-Linh Thai [D] | Rep. Suzanne Schmidt [R] |
Rep. Mari Leavitt [D] | Rep. Amy Walen [D] | Rep. Jessica Bateman [D] | Rep. Leonard Christian [R] |
Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] | Rep. Alex Ramel [D] | Rep. Beth Doglio [D] | Rep. Dave Paul [D] |
Rep. Julia Reed [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] | Rep. Shelley Kloba [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2023-02-10 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2023-02-03 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2023-01-25 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
18 | 130 | 040 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 130 | 175 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 43 | 842 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
71 | 24 | New Code | See Bill Text |