WA HB1541 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-8)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-10 - Scheduled for executive session in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:00 AM
Pending: House State Government & Tribal Relations Committee
Hearing: Feb 10 @ 8:00 am in House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the nothing about us without us act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing the nothing about us without us act.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-10HouseScheduled for executive session in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:00 AM
2023-02-03HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:00 AM.
2023-01-24HouseFirst reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations.

Same As/Similar To

SB5616 (Crossfiled) 2023-01-30 - First reading, referred to State Government & Elections.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
43New CodeSee Bill Text
4306dNew CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback