WA HB1539 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Restricting the use of consignment contracts in the sale of used manufactured/mobile homes.
Title
Restricting the use of consignment contracts in the sale of used manufactured/mobile homes.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] | Rep. Allister O'Brien [D] | Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] | Rep. Lawrence Springer [D] |
Sen. Judith Warnick [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-01-23 | First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5668 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-11 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1539&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1539.pdf |