WA HB1528 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Human Services, Youth, & Early Learning Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Human Services, Youth, & Early Learning Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning adult protective services.
Title
Concerning adult protective services.
Sponsors
Sen. Jessica Bateman [D] | Rep. Tarra Simmons [D] | Rep. Melanie Morgan [D] | Sen. Marcus Riccelli [D] |
Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] | Rep. Nicole Macri [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2023-01-24 | House | First reading, referred to Human Services, Youth, & Early Learning. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5370 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-06 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
68 | 50 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 34 | 020 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 34 | 063 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 34 | 095 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1528&Year=2023&Initiative=false |
Text | https://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/House%20Bills/1528.pdf |