WA HB1516 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Effective date 8/1/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Effective date 8/1/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing an exemption for certain lodging services from the convention and trade center tax.
Title
Providing an exemption for certain lodging services from the convention and trade center tax.
Sponsors
Rep. Eric Pettigrew [D] | Rep. Sharon Santos [D] | Rep. Chad Magendanz [R] | Rep. Cary Condotta [R] |
Rep. Joe Fitzgibbon [D] | Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-14 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | House | Effective date 8/1/2015. |
2015-05-01 | House | Chapter 151, 2015 Laws. |
2015-05-01 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-04-21 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2015-04-17 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-04-16 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2015-03-09 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2015-03-05 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2015-03-05 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-03-05 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2015-02-27 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-02-17 | House | FIN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-02-17 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 3:30 PM. |
2015-01-30 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2015-01-22 | House | First reading, referred to Finance |