WA HB1508 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-01-31 - Third reading, passed; yeas, 43; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 1.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Promoting student health and readiness through meal and nutrition programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Promoting student health and readiness through meal and nutrition programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 43 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-10 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 83 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 84 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 81 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 90 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-31SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 43; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2018-01-31SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-01-31SenateCommittee amendment
2018-01-31SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2018-01-26SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2018-01-25SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2018-01-25SenateMinority; do not pass.
2018-01-25SenateWM - Majority; do pass with amendment
2018-01-25SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2018-01-24SenatePublic hearing and executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2018-01-12SenateFirst reading, referred to Ways & Means.
2018-01-10SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 83; nays, 15; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2018-01-10SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-01-10SenateFloor amendment
2018-01-10SenateReturned to second reading for amendment.
2018-01-09SenateRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading.
2018-01-08SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-06-21SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-06-21SenateBy resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
2017-05-29SenateFirst reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.
2017-05-25SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 84; nays, 10; absent, 0; excused, 4.
2017-05-23SenateRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading.
2017-05-23SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-05-23SenateBy resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
2017-05-05SenateFirst reading, referred to Ways & Means.
2017-05-02SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 81; nays, 11; absent, 0; excused, 6.
2017-05-01SenateRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading.
2017-04-24SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-04-23SenateBy resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
2017-04-04SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2017-04-04SenateMinority; do not pass.
2017-04-04SenateWM - Majority; do pass with amendment
2017-04-04SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2017-04-03SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2017-03-28SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2017-03-27SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2017-03-27SenateEDU - Majority; do pass with amendment
2017-03-27SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM.
2017-03-21SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM.
2017-03-07SenateFirst reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.
2017-03-02HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 90; nays, 8; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2017-03-02HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2017-03-02HouseFloor amendment
2017-03-02House1st substitute bill substituted
2017-02-28HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2017-02-24HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2017-02-23HouseMinority; do not pass.
2017-02-23HouseAPP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2017-02-23HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2017-02-22HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2017-02-14HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2017-02-09HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2017-02-09HouseMinority; do not pass.
2017-02-09HouseED - Majority; do pass with amendment
2017-02-09HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM.
2017-02-02HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM.
2017-01-23HouseFirst reading, referred to Education

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1508&year=2017
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1508.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1508-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1508-S.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1508-S.E2.pdf
Roll Callhttp://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?billNumber=1508&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-02-2017
Roll Callhttp://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?billNumber=1508&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=05-02-2017
Roll Callhttp://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?billNumber=1508&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=05-25-2017
Roll Callhttp://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?billNumber=1508&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=01-10-2018
Roll Callhttp://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?billNumber=1508&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=01-31-2018

Bill Comments

feedback