WA HB1507 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - First reading, referred to Law & Justice.
Pending: Senate Law & Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning fair housing training for officers or board members in common interest communities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning fair housing training for officers or board members in common interest communities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-02-09 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 87 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - House - House Committee on Housing: do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-13SenateFirst reading, referred to Law & Justice.
2024-02-09HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 74; nays, 23; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2024-02-09HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2024-01-16HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading.
2024-01-08HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2023-04-23HouseBy resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
2023-03-02SenateFirst reading, referred to Law & Justice.
2023-02-28HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 87; nays, 10; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2023-02-28HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2023-02-27HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2023-02-10HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2023-02-09HouseHOUS - Majority; do pass.
2023-02-09HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Housing at 8:00 AM.
2023-01-30HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Housing at 1:30 PM.
2023-01-23HouseFirst reading, referred to Housing.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6432New CodeSee Bill Text
6434New CodeSee Bill Text
6438New CodeSee Bill Text
6490New CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1507&Year=2023&Initiative=false
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/House%20Bills/1507.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1507%20HBA%20HOUS%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1507%20HBR%20HOUS%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1507%20HBR%20APH%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1507%20HBR%20APH%2024.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=128270&actionText=HOUS%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=30707&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=128270&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=02-28-2023&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1507&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=128270&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=02-09-2024&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1507&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24

Bill Comments

feedback