WA HB1507 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-16 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-16 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Enhancing election reconciliation reports.
Title
Enhancing election reconciliation reports.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Holy [R] | Rep. Zack Hudgins [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-16 | House | Effective date 7/23/2017. |
2017-05-16 | House | Chapter 300, 2017 Laws. |
2017-05-16 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-04-18 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-04-14 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | SGOV - Majority; do pass. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government at 8:00 AM. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government at 8:00 AM. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government. |
2017-02-28 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-02-28 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-02-28 | House | Floor amendment |
2017-02-14 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-08 | House | SEIT - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-08 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-07 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2017-01-23 | House | First reading, referred to State Government |