WA HB1493 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on April 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-22 - Effective date 7/22/2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on April 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-22 - Effective date 7/22/2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing greater transparency to the health professions disciplinary process.
Title
Providing greater transparency to the health professions disciplinary process.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-13 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 61 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-22 | Effective date 7/22/2011. | |
2011-04-22 | Chapter 157, 2011 Laws. | |
2011-04-22 | Governor signed. | |
2011-04-19 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2011-04-18 | President signed. | |
2011-04-18 | Speaker signed. | |
2011-04-13 | Passed final passage; yeas, 61; nays, 35; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2011-04-13 | House concurred in Senate amendments. | |
2011-04-07 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2011-04-07 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-04-07 | Committee amendment adopted as amended. | |
2011-04-06 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-03-31 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2011-03-25 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-03-24 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2011-03-24 | HEA - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2011-03-23 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long-Term Care at 9:00 AM. | |
2011-03-17 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long-Term Care at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-03-03 | First reading, referred to Health & Long-Term Care. | |
2011-03-01 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 68; nays, 29; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2011-03-01 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-01 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2011-02-26 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-02-25 | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. | |
2011-02-23 | Referred to Rules 2 Review. | |
2011-02-23 | Committee relieved of further consideration. | |
2011-02-16 | Referred to Health & Human Services Appropriations & Oversight. | |
2011-02-16 | Public hearing, executive action scheduled, but the motion to report the bill out of the House Committee on Health & Human Services Appropriations & Oversight at 6:00 PM failed. | |
2011-02-10 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2011-02-10 | HCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2011-02-10 | HCW - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2011-02-10 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-02-02 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. | |
2011-01-24 | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5775 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.