WA HB1474 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Strengthening penalty and audit tools for employer violations in unemployment insurance.
Title
Strengthening penalty and audit tools for employer violations in unemployment insurance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-15 - House - House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-02-15 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-02-15 | House | LAWS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-15 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 3:30 PM. |
2021-02-12 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. |
2021-02-10 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 10:00 AM. |
2021-02-03 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards. |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
50 | 12 | 072 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
50 | 12 | 220 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
50 | 24 | 190 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |