WA HB1465 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-08 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-08 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting from public disclosure certain information regarding reports on wolf depredations.
Title
Exempting from public disclosure certain information regarding reports on wolf depredations.
Sponsors
Sen. Shelly Short [R] | Rep. Kristine Lytton [D] | Rep. Joel Kretz [R] | Rep. Joe Schmick [R] |
Rep. Joe Fitzgibbon [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-20 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | House | Effective date 7/23/2017. |
2017-05-08 | House | Chapter 246, 2017 Laws. |
2017-05-08 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-04-23 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-04-21 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-04-20 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 92; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2017-04-20 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Returned to second reading for amendment. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Senate receded from amendments. |
2017-04-18 | House | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments. Asks Senate to recede from amendments. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 40; nays, 7; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | NRP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | First reading, referred to Natural Resources & Parks. |
2017-03-07 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2017-03-07 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-03-07 | House | Floor amendment |
2017-03-07 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2017-02-28 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-17 | House | SEIT - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-17 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2017-02-01 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-20 | House | First reading, referred to State Government |