WA HB1455 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-22 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the aeronautics industry.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning the aeronautics industry.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-22HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2019-02-20HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-02-20HouseCWD - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-20HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-30HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-22HouseFirst reading, referred to College & Workforce Development.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback