WA HB1454 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Limiting industrial insurance benefits for injuries or diseases caused by use of intoxicating liquor or drugs.
Title
Limiting industrial insurance benefits for injuries or diseases caused by use of intoxicating liquor or drugs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-01-11 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-01-21 | House | First reading, referred to Labor |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1454&year=2015 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2015-16/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1454.pdf |