WA HB1454 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on May 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-03 - Effective date 7/22/2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on May 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-03 - Effective date 7/22/2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Regarding testing for bloodborne pathogens.
Title
Regarding testing for bloodborne pathogens.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-08 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-03 | Effective date 7/22/2011. | |
2011-05-03 | Chapter 232, 2011 Laws. | |
2011-05-03 | Governor signed. | |
2011-04-19 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2011-04-18 | President signed. | |
2011-04-18 | Speaker signed. | |
2011-04-08 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2011-04-08 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-04-06 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-04-05 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2011-03-11 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-03-10 | HEA - Majority; do pass. | |
2011-03-10 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long-Term Care at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-03-09 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long-Term Care at 8:00 AM. | |
2011-02-15 | First reading, referred to Health & Long-Term Care. | |
2011-02-14 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 5. | |
2011-02-14 | Placed on third reading. | |
2011-02-14 | Committee recommendations adopted. | |
2011-02-11 | Placed on second reading suspension calendar. | |
2011-02-08 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-02-03 | HCW - Majority; do pass. | |
2011-02-03 | HCW - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2011-02-03 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-01-21 | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |