WA HB1453 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning voters' pamphlets.
Title
Concerning voters' pamphlets.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Bergquist [D] | Rep. Mike Volz [R] | Sen. Javier Valdez [D] | Rep. Debra Lekanoff [D] |
Sen. Sharon Shewmake [D] | Rep. Robert Sutherland [R] | Rep. Marcus Riccelli [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on State Government & Elections: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on State Government & Elections: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 2 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-03 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 90 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on State Government & Elections: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 2 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-03 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 90 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | SGE - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 8:30 AM. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government & Elections. |
2022-01-26 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 70; nays, 27; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2022-01-25 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading. |
2022-01-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-04-25 | House | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | SGE - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2021-03-06 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government & Elections. |
2021-03-03 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 90; nays, 7; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-03-03 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-03-03 | House | Floor amendment |
2021-03-02 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-02-11 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-02-11 | House | SGOV - Majority; do pass. |
2021-02-11 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 10:00 AM. |
2021-02-08 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-02 | House | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29a | 32 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
29a | 32 | 020 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
29a | 32 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
29a | 32 | 060 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
29a | 32 | 070 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
29a | 32 | 090 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
29a | 32 | 110 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
29a | 32 | 121 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
29a | 32 | 210 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
29a | 32 | 220 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
29a | 32 | 230 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
29a | 32 | 241 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
29a | 32 | 250 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
29a | 32 | 260 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
29a | 32 | 280 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
29a | 72 | 025 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |