WA HB1453 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminating the backlog of land use applications in the Columbia River Gorge commission for the purpose of protecting and enhancing the natural scenery and regional economic development of the Columbia River Gorge national scenic area.
Title
Eliminating the backlog of land use applications in the Columbia River Gorge commission for the purpose of protecting and enhancing the natural scenery and regional economic development of the Columbia River Gorge national scenic area.
Sponsors
Rep. Liz Pike [R] | Rep. Sharon Wylie [D] | Sen. Dean Takko [D] | Rep. Brandon Vick [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-01-11 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-02-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on General Government & Information Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2015-02-20 | House | Referred to General Government & Information Technology. |
2015-02-19 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-02-19 | House | AGNR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-02-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 1:30 PM. |
2015-02-10 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. |
2015-01-21 | House | First reading, referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources |