WA HB1446 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a utility from being assessed a penalty for not meeting its biennial acquisition target for cost-effective conservation in special circumstances outside the utility's control.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibiting a utility from being assessed a penalty for not meeting its biennial acquisition target for cost-effective conservation in special circumstances outside the utility's control.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology: do pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House Committee on Environment & Energy: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-16HouseEffective date 7/25/2021.
2021-04-16HouseChapter 79, 2021 Laws.
2021-04-16HouseGovernor signed.
2021-04-13HouseDelivered to Governor.
2021-04-09SenatePresident signed.
2021-04-07HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-04-06SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2021-04-06SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-03-31SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2021-03-24SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-03-23SenateMinority; do not pass.
2021-03-23SenateENET - Majority; do pass.
2021-03-23SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:30 AM.
2021-03-17SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM.
2021-03-06SenateFirst reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology.
2021-03-03HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2021-03-03HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-03-03House1st substitute bill substituted
2021-03-01HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2021-02-15HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2021-02-15HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2021-02-15HouseMinority; do not pass.
2021-02-15HouseENVI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-02-15HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 1:30 PM.
2021-02-09HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM.
2021-02-01HouseFirst reading, referred to Environment & Energy.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
19285040Amended CodeSee Bill Text
19285060Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1446&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1446.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1446-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/House/1446-S.SL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/1446-S.PL.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1446%20HBA%20ENVI%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1446%20HBR%20ENVI%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1446-S%20HBR%20APH%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1446-S%20SBA%20ENET%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1446-S%20SBR%20ENET%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1446-S%20SBR%20ENET%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1446-S%20HBR%20PL%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1446-S%20SBR%20APS%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1446-S%20HBR%20FBR%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=124222&actionText=ENVI%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28616&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=124222&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-03-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1446&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=124222&actionText=ENET%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=28921&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=124222&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-06-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1446&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments

feedback