WA HB1436 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-2)
Status: Passed on May 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-11 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-2)
Status: Passed on May 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-11 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Funding special education.
Title
Funding special education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-22 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass with amendment(s) by Early Learning & K-12 Education (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass with amendment(s) by Early Learning & K-12 Education (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-11 | House | Effective date 7/23/2023. |
2023-05-11 | House | Chapter 417, 2023 Laws. |
2023-05-11 | House | Governor partially vetoed. |
2023-04-23 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2023-04-23 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-04-23 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-04-22 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2023-04-22 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Returned to second reading for amendment. |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Senate receded from amendments. |
2023-04-19 | House | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments. Asks Senate to recede from amendments. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Committee amendment not adopted. |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 12:45 PM. |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2023-03-27 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2023-03-27 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2023-03-06 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2023-03-02 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2023-03-02 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-03-02 | House | Floor amendment |
2023-03-02 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2023-02-28 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2023-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2023-02-20 | House | APP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-02-20 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2023-02-09 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 4:00 PM. |
2023-01-19 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2023-01-19 | House | Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2023-01-18 | House | First reading, referred to Education. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28a | 150 | 390 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28a | 150 | 392 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28a | 155 | New Code | See Bill Text |