WA HB1432 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-20 - Effective date 7/22/2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-20 - Effective date 7/22/2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Permitting private employers to exercise a voluntary veterans' preference in employment.
Title
Permitting private employers to exercise a voluntary veterans' preference in employment.
Sponsors
Rep. John Ahern [R] | Rep. Tami Green [D] | Rep. Troy Kelley [D] | Rep. Tina Orwall [D] |
Rep. Jay Rodne [R] | Rep. Matt Shea [R] | Sen. Kevin Van De Wege [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-25 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-25 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-20 | Effective date 7/22/2011. | |
2011-04-20 | Chapter 144, 2011 Laws. | |
2011-04-20 | Governor signed. | |
2011-04-14 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2011-04-11 | President signed. | |
2011-04-09 | Speaker signed. | |
2011-04-06 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2011-04-06 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-04-04 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-03-24 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-03-23 | LCCP - Majority; do pass. | |
2011-03-22 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor and Commerce & Consumer Protection at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-03-21 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor and Commerce & Consumer Protection at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-03-01 | First reading, referred to Labor, Commerce & Consumer Protection. | |
2011-02-25 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2011-02-25 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-02-22 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-02-15 | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. | |
2011-02-08 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-02-02 | LWD - Majority; do pass. | |
2011-02-02 | LWD - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2011-02-02 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-01-21 | First reading, referred to Labor & Workforce Development. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5841 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.