WA HB1431 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designating certain state routes as highways of statewide significance.
Title
Designating certain state routes as highways of statewide significance.
Sponsors
Rep. Judith Clibborn [D] | Rep. Deborah Eddy [D] | Rep. Phyllis Kenney [D] | Sen. Marko Liias [D] |
Sen. John McCoy [D] | Rep. Jeff Morris [D] | Rep. Michael Sells [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-04-26 | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2009-04-19 | Referred to Rules. | |
2009-04-17 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-03-26 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-26 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2009-03-26 | TRAN - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-03-24 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-03-23 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-03-03 | First reading, referred to Transportation. | |
2009-02-27 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2009-02-27 | Placed on third reading. | |
2009-02-27 | Committee recommendations adopted. | |
2009-02-26 | Placed on second reading suspension calendar. | |
2009-02-09 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-03 | TR - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-02-03 | TR - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-02-03 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-01-27 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-01-21 | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5363 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1431&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1431.pdf |