WA HB1426 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Referred to Health Care & Wellness.
Pending: Senate Health Care & Wellness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Referred to Health Care & Wellness.
Pending: Senate Health Care & Wellness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning persons and entities to whom the department of health may provide prescription monitoring program data.
Title
Concerning persons and entities to whom the department of health may provide prescription monitoring program data.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health Care. |
2017-03-03 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 85; nays, 12; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2017-03-03 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-03-03 | House | Floor amendment |
2017-03-03 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2017-03-02 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2017-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-24 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-24 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-24 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2017-02-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-17 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2017-02-17 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-17 | House | HCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-17 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 10:00 AM. |
2017-02-01 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-19 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness |