WA HB1425 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Expanding scholarships for community and technical college students.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expanding scholarships for community and technical college students.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage without Senate Amendments (Y: 37 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development: do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House Committee on College & Workforce Development: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-26HouseEffective date 7/25/2021.
2021-04-26HouseChapter 133, 2021 Laws.
2021-04-26HouseGovernor signed.
2021-04-22HouseDelivered to Governor.
2021-04-21SenatePresident signed.
2021-04-20HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-04-19SenatePassed final passage; yeas, 37; nays, 12; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2021-04-19SenateSenate receded from amendments.
2021-04-16HouseHouse refuses to concur in Senate amendments. Asks Senate to recede from amendments.
2021-04-03SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3.
2021-04-03SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-04-03SenateFloor amendment
2021-03-31SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2021-03-19SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-03-18SenateHEWD - Majority; do pass.
2021-03-18SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM.
2021-03-11SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM.
2021-03-01SenateFirst reading, referred to Higher Education & Workforce Development.
2021-02-25HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2021-02-25HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-02-25House1st substitute bill substituted
2021-02-23HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2021-02-15HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2021-02-11HouseCWD - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-02-11HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 10:00 AM.
2021-02-04HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 10:00 AM.
2021-01-29HouseFirst reading, referred to College & Workforce Development.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
28b145010Amended CodeSee Bill Text
28b145030Amended CodeSee Bill Text
28b145040Amended CodeSee Bill Text
28b145100Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1425&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1425.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1425-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/1425-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/House/1425-S.SL.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/1425-S%20AMS%20LIIA%20S2575.2.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1425%20HBA%20CWD%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1425%20HBR%20CWD%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1425-S%20HBR%20APH%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1425-S%20SBA%20HEWD%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1425-S%20SBR%20HEWD%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1425-S%20SBR%20HEWD%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1425-S%20HBR%20SA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1425-S%20SBR%20APS%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1425-S%20HBR%20PL%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=124161&actionText=CWD%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28607&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=124161&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=02-25-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1425&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=124161&actionText=HEWD%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=28788&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=124161&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-03-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1425&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=124161&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-19-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1425&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments 750

feedback