WA HB1424 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - President signed.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning consumer protection with respect to the sale of dogs and cats.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning consumer protection with respect to the sale of dogs and cats.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade: do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-07 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-09SenatePresident signed.
2021-04-07HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-04-05SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 31; nays, 18; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2021-04-05SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-03-26SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2021-03-26SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-03-25SenateMinority; do not pass.
2021-03-25SenateBFST - Majority; do pass.
2021-03-25SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade at 8:00 AM.
2021-03-23SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade at 8:00 AM.
2021-03-10SenateFirst reading, referred to Business, Financial Services & Trade.
2021-03-07HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 68; nays, 30; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2021-03-07HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-03-07House1st substitute bill substituted
2021-02-25HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2021-02-15HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2021-02-15HouseMinority; do not pass.
2021-02-15HouseCPB - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-02-15HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 10:00 AM.
2021-02-11HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 10:00 AM.
2021-01-29HouseFirst reading, referred to Consumer Protection & Business.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1652New CodeSee Bill Text
1652310Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1424&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1424.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1424-S.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1424%20HBA%20CPB%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1424%20HBR%20CPB%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1424-S%20HBR%20APH%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1424-S%20SBA%20BFST%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1424-S%20SBR%20BFST%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1424-S%20SBR%20BFST%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1424-S%20HBR%20PL%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1424-S%20SBR%20APS%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=124160&actionText=CPB%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28650&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=124160&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-07-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1424&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=124160&actionText=BFST%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=28816&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=124160&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-05-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1424&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments

feedback