WA HB1423 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning smoke management civil enforcement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning smoke management civil enforcement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology: do pass (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House Committee on Environment & Energy: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-26HouseEffective date 7/25/2021.
2021-04-26HouseChapter 132, 2021 Laws.
2021-04-26HouseGovernor signed.
2021-04-22HouseDelivered to Governor.
2021-04-20SenatePresident signed.
2021-04-13HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-04-11SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2021-04-11SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-04-10SenatePlaced on second reading.
2021-03-24SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-03-23SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2021-03-23SenateMinority; do not pass.
2021-03-23SenateENET - Majority; do pass.
2021-03-23SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:30 AM.
2021-03-17SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM.
2021-03-04SenateFirst reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology.
2021-03-01HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2021-03-01HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-03-01House1st substitute bill substituted
2021-02-24HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2021-02-15HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2021-02-11HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2021-02-11HouseENVI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-02-11HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 1:30 PM.
2021-02-04HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 1:30 PM.
2021-01-29HouseFirst reading, referred to Environment & Energy.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
70a153160Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1423&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1423.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1423-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/1423-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/House/1423-S.SL.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1423%20HBA%20ENVI%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1423%20HBR%20ENVI%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1423-S%20HBR%20APH%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1423-S%20SBA%20ENET%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1423-S%20SBR%20ENET%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1423-S%20SBR%20ENET%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1423-S%20HBR%20PL%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1423-S%20SBR%20APS%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1423-S%20HBR%20FBR%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=124159&actionText=ENVI%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28608&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=124159&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-01-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1423&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=124159&actionText=ENET%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=28921&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=124159&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-11-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1423&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments

feedback