WA HB1423 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Encouraging economic development by exempting certain counties from the forest land compensating tax.
Title
Encouraging economic development by exempting certain counties from the forest land compensating tax.
Sponsors
Rep. Sherry Appleton [D] | Rep. Frederick Finn [D] | Rep. Kathryn Haigh [D] | Sen. Christine Rolfes [D] |
Rep. Larry Seaquist [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-01-09 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-11-28 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-26 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-02-17 | Referred to Ways & Means. | |
2011-02-17 | CDH - Majority; do pass. | |
2011-02-17 | CDH - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2011-02-17 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Community & Economic Development & Housing at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-02-14 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Community & Economic Development & Housing at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-01-20 | First reading, referred to Community Development & Housing. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5169 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1423&year=2011 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2011-12/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1423.pdf |