WA HB1407 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Effective date 7/22/2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Effective date 7/22/2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing the negotiated sale and conveyance of all or part of a water system by a municipal corporation to first class and code cities.
Title
Allowing the negotiated sale and conveyance of all or part of a water system by a municipal corporation to first class and code cities.
Sponsors
Sen. Jan Angel [R] | Rep. Hans Dunshee [D] | Rep. Michael Hope [R] | Rep. Ruth Kagi [D] |
Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-14 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 90 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-26 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 87 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-26 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 87 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Effective date 7/22/2011. | |
2011-05-10 | Chapter 285, 2011 Laws. | |
2011-05-10 | Governor signed. | |
2011-04-19 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2011-04-18 | President signed. | |
2011-04-18 | Speaker signed. | |
2011-04-14 | Passed final passage; yeas, 90; nays, 7; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2011-04-14 | House concurred in Senate amendments. | |
2011-04-04 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 2; absent, 2; excused, 1. | |
2011-04-04 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-04-04 | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. | |
2011-03-18 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-03-17 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-03-16 | GO - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2011-03-15 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations and Tribal Relations & Elections at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-03-10 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Government Operations and Tribal Relations & Elections at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-03-01 | First reading, referred to Government Operations, Tribal Relations & Elections. | |
2011-02-26 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 87; nays, 10; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2011-02-26 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-02-24 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. | |
2011-02-22 | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. | |
2011-02-16 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-02-15 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2011-02-15 | LG - Majority; do pass. | |
2011-02-15 | LG - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2011-02-15 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-02-01 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-01-20 | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5248 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.