WA HB1397 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting property owned or used by community and technical colleges from property tax.
Title
Exempting property owned or used by community and technical colleges from property tax.
Sponsors
Rep. Laurie Dolan [D] | Rep. Luanne Van Werven [R] | Rep. Sherry Appleton [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
Rep. Christine Kilduff [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-01-19 | House | First reading, referred to Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SB5380 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - Due to Senate committee reorganization, referred to Higher Education & Workforce Development.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1397&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1397.pdf |