WA HB1388 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Effective date 7/1/2018*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Changing the designation of the state behavioral health authority from the department of social and health services to the health care authority and transferring the related powers, functions, and duties to the health care authority and the department of health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Changing the designation of the state behavioral health authority from the department of social and health services to the health care authority and transferring the related powers, functions, and duties to the health care authority and the department of health.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-22HouseEffective date 7/1/2018*.
2018-03-22HouseChapter 201, 2018 Laws.
2018-03-22HouseGovernor signed.
2018-03-06HouseDelivered to Governor.
2018-03-06SenatePresident signed.
2018-03-03HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-02-28SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 2; absent, 3; excused, 0.
2018-02-28SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-02-27SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2018-02-26SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2018-02-26SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2018-02-26SenateWM - Majority; do pass.
2018-02-26SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
2018-02-24SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM.
2018-02-21SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2018-02-20SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2018-02-20SenateHLTC - Majority; do pass.
2018-02-20SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 10:00 AM.
2018-02-19SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 10:00 AM.
2018-02-10SenateFirst reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care.
2018-02-07SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2018-02-07SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-02-07SenateFloor amendment
2018-02-07SenateReturned to second reading for amendment.
2018-02-06SenatePlaced on third reading by Rules Committee.
2018-01-08SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-07-20SenateReturned to House Rules 3.
2017-06-23SenateRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading.
2017-06-21SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-06-21SenateBy resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
2017-06-01SenateFirst reading, referred to Ways & Means.
2017-05-25SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 68; nays, 26; absent, 0; excused, 4.
2017-05-25SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2017-05-25SenateFloor amendment
2017-05-25SenateReturned to second reading for amendment.
2017-05-25SenateRules suspended.
2017-05-23SenateRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading.
2017-04-24SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-04-23SenateBy resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
2017-03-29SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2017-03-28SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2017-03-28SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2017-03-28SenateHLTH - Majority; do pass with amendment
2017-03-28SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM.
2017-03-14SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM.
2017-03-06SenateFirst reading, referred to Health Care.
2017-03-02HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 73; nays, 25; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2017-03-02HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2017-03-02House1st substitute bill substituted
2017-03-01HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2017-02-24HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2017-02-24HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2017-02-24HouseMinority; do not pass.
2017-02-24HouseAPP - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Health Care & Wellness.
2017-02-24HousePublic hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM.
2017-02-17HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2017-02-17HouseMinority; do not pass.
2017-02-17HouseHCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2017-02-17HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 10:00 AM.
2017-01-31HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM.
2017-01-18HouseFirst reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness

Same As/Similar To

SB5259 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1388&year=2017
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1388.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1388-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1388-S.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1388-S.E2.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/1388-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/House/1388-S.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttp://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?billNumber=1388&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-02-2017
Roll Callhttp://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?billNumber=1388&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=05-25-2017
Roll Callhttp://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?billNumber=1388&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=02-07-2018
Roll Callhttp://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?billNumber=1388&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=02-28-2018

Bill Comments 750

feedback