WA HB1368 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Restoring the title and registration advisory committee.
Title
Restoring the title and registration advisory committee.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Armstrong [R] | Rep. Roger Goodman [D] | Rep. Troy Kelley [D] | Sen. James McCune [R] |
Sen. Mark Miloscia [R] | Sen. Judith Warnick [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-01-09 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-11-28 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-26 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-01-19 | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1368&year=2011 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2011-12/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1368.pdf |