WA HB1340 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-07 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing a statewide free college program by changing the state need grant to the Washington college promise scholarship.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a statewide free college program by changing the state need grant to the Washington college promise scholarship.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-07HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2019-02-05HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-02-05HouseCWD - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-05HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-30HouseExecutive session, but the motion to report the bill out of the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM failed.
2019-01-29HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-22HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-18HouseFirst reading, referred to College & Workforce Development.

Same As/Similar To

SB5393 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-14 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback