WA HB1339 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-25 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-25 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Correcting statutory references.
Title
Correcting statutory references.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-25 | Effective date 7/26/2009. | |
2009-04-25 | Chapter 225, 2009 Laws. | |
2009-04-25 | Governor signed. | |
2009-04-20 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2009-04-13 | President signed. | |
2009-04-10 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-04-10 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2009-04-10 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-08 | Placed on second reading consent calendar. | |
2009-03-17 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-17 | LCCP - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-03-16 | Public hearing, executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor, and Commerce & Consumer Protection at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-02-25 | First reading, referred to Labor, Commerce & Consumer Protection. | |
2009-02-23 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2009-02-23 | Placed on third reading. | |
2009-02-23 | Committee recommendations adopted. | |
2009-02-19 | Placed on second reading suspension calendar by Rules Committee. | |
2009-01-27 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-01-23 | CL - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-01-23 | CL - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-01-23 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Labor at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-01-19 | First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5257 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.