WA HB1337 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-21 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM.
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-21 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM.
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning accessory dwelling units.
Title
Concerning accessory dwelling units.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-21 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-12 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-02-09 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2021-02-03 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2021-01-21 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 63 | 210 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
35a | 63 | 230 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 70 | 677 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 70a | New Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 70a | 400 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 70a | 696 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 21c | 495 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 63a | 215 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 14 | New Code | See Bill Text |